TX SB1048 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an independent school district holding elections on the November uniform election date and to the ballot for certain independent school district elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an independent school district holding elections on the November uniform election date and to the ballot for certain independent school district elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Elections
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateAmended
2019-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Fallon
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-02SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback