TX SB1034 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voting by mail, including the cancellation of an application for a ballot to be voted by mail.
Title
Relating to voting by mail, including the cancellation of an application for a ballot to be voted by mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - SB 1034Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-27 | House | Amended |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to Elections |
2015-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |