TX SB1033 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care and prohibiting discriminatory abortions; creating an administrative penalty, a civil remedy, and a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care and prohibiting discriminatory abortions; creating an administrative penalty, a civil remedy, and a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-07SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-07SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenatePassed
2019-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-07SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2434 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback