TX SB1031 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a deduction under the franchise tax for certain contracts with the federal government.
Title
Relating to a deduction under the franchise tax for certain contracts with the federal government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |