TX SB1030 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property leased to and used by certain schools.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property leased to and used by certain schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR42 (Enabling for) 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions