TX SB1025 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the legislature, governor, and certain political subdivisions with respect to disasters and emergencies.
Title
Relating to the authority of the legislature, governor, and certain political subdivisions with respect to disasters and emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Paxton |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended FA1 Hinojosa |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Hinojosa |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR45 (Enabling for) 2021-04-16 - Referred to State Affairs