TX SB1018 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an early voting ballot voted by mail.
Title
Relating to an early voting ballot voted by mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1464 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - Referred to Elections
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Voting Systems
Electronic Information Systems
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Voting Systems
Electronic Information Systems
SECRETARY OF STATE