TX SB1017 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the advisory council on postsecondary education for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Title
Relating to the creation of the advisory council on postsecondary education for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1668 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - RV#1667 (Y: 116 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1668 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - RV#1667 (Y: 116 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1668 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1667 |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Leman |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Leman |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to table fails 1-Leman |
2019-05-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Leman |
2019-05-21 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3932 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Governor
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Governor
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS