TX SB1005 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the number of days that certain tangible personal property that is exempt from ad valorem taxation due to its location in this state for a temporary period may be located in this state for the purpose of qualifying for the tax exemption.
Title
Relating to the number of days that certain tangible personal property that is exempt from ad valorem taxation due to its location in this state for a temporary period may be located in this state for the purpose of qualifying for the tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR43 (Enabling for) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1005 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01005I.htm |