TX SB1003 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to location requirements for the construction of certain wind-powered energy devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to location requirements for the construction of certain wind-powered energy devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-24HouseRead first time
2021-05-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenatePassed as amended
2021-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18SenateAmended
2021-05-18SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Gutierrez
2021-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-04SenateFiled
2021-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4007 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1003
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01003I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01003S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01003E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01003S3F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01003S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01003S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=13

Bill Comments

feedback