TX SB1001 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to vehicle safety inspections, including vehicles exempt from those inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vehicle safety inspections, including vehicles exempt from those inspections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1986 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1465 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-26SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed as amended
2017-05-21HouseAmended
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1001
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01001I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01001S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01001E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01001H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01001F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1001&RcdVtNo=1465&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1001&RcdVtNo=1986&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=54

Bill Comments

feedback