TX SB10 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain requirements applicable to political subdivisions and other entities that engage in lobbying and to the applicability of lobbyist registration requirements to a person who provides legal services to a political subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain requirements applicable to political subdivisions and other entities that engage in lobbying and to the applicability of lobbyist registration requirements to a person who provides legal services to a political subdivision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HousePostponed 9/18/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-25HousePostponed 5/25/21 10:05 PM
2021-05-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-25HousePostponed 5/25/21 7:30 PM
2021-05-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-24HousePostponed 5/25/21 6:00 AM
2021-05-24HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-24HousePostponed 5/24/21 8:00 PM
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-20HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-20HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-15SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenatePassed
2021-04-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Johnson
2021-04-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15SenateAmended
2021-04-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Gutierrez
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
2021-04-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15SenateAmended
2021-04-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
2021-04-15SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB10
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00010I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00010S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00010E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00010H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00010S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00010S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00010S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00010S2F4.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00010I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00010I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00010S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00010S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00010E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00010H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00010H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback