TX SB10 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to actions on and liability associated with certain insurance claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to actions on and liability associated with certain insurance claims.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-14SenateRead first time
2017-02-13SenateFiled
2017-02-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback