TX HR999 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Four Corner Oil in Anahuac on its grand opening.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Four Corner Oil in Anahuac on its grand opening.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20HouseReported enrolled
2023-04-20HouseAdopted
2023-04-20HouseLaid before the House
2023-04-20HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-04-17HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-11HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback