TX HR977 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Jim Davenport, Jimmy Marquez, and Alan Johnson for their work with Student Veteran Services at the University of North Texas.
Title
Commending Jim Davenport, Jimmy Marquez, and Alan Johnson for their work with Student Veteran Services at the University of North Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed |