TX HR963 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Lubbock Christian University women's basketball team on winning the 2021 NCAA Division II national championship.
Title
Congratulating the Lubbock Christian University women's basketball team on winning the 2021 NCAA Division II national championship.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Filed |