TX HR96 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Bishop John E. McCarthy of Austin.
Title
In memory of Bishop John E. McCarthy of Austin.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Jessica Farrar [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Mary Perez [D] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |