TX HR893 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing April 13, 2023, as Texas Food Bank Day at the State Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing April 13, 2023, as Texas Food Bank Day at the State Capitol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseReported enrolled
2023-04-13HouseAdopted
2023-04-13HouseRules suspended
2023-04-14HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-04-12HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-05HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-03-31HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback