TX HR826 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 2021 as Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month.
Title
Recognizing May 2021 as Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] |
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
ASIAN AMERICAN & PACIFIC ISLANDER HERITAGE MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates