TX HR81 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the members of American Heritage Girls Troop TX3170 in Frisco on their receipt of the President's Volunteer Service Award.
Title
Congratulating the members of American Heritage Girls Troop TX3170 in Frisco on their receipt of the President's Volunteer Service Award.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |