TX HR793 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Candace Printz of El Dorado High School in El Paso on her selection as a 2019 Environmental Educator of the Year by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Candace Printz of El Dorado High School in El Paso on her selection as a 2019 Environmental Educator of the Year by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReported enrolled
2019-03-21HouseAdopted
2019-03-21HouseLaid before the House
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback