TX HR78 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Neal White on earning first place in extemporaneous informative speaking at the 2011 UIL Conference 4A State Academics Spring Meet.
Title
Congratulating Neal White on earning first place in extemporaneous informative speaking at the 2011 UIL Conference 4A State Academics Spring Meet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-10 | Filed |