TX HR758 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Dr. Carmen Olivas Graham for her service on the occasion of Women's History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Dr. Carmen Olivas Graham for her service on the occasion of Women's History Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseReported enrolled
2023-04-05HouseAdopted
2023-04-05HouseLaid before the House
2023-04-05HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-04-03HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-03-29HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-03-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback