TX HR717 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Fabol R. Hughes for his service as mayor of the City of Katy.
Title
Commending Fabol R. Hughes for his service as mayor of the City of Katy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |