TX HR706 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring Norma Frances "Tootsie" Tomanetz for her achievements as a barbecue pit master.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Norma Frances "Tootsie" Tomanetz for her achievements as a barbecue pit master.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-03-19HouseAdopted
2019-03-19HouseRules suspended
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback