TX HR691 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Alejandra Robledo for winning the second annual Celebration of Spanglish Day Creative Writing Contest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Alejandra Robledo for winning the second annual Celebration of Spanglish Day Creative Writing Contest.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20HouseReported enrolled
2017-03-16HouseAdopted
2017-03-16HouseLaid before the House
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback