TX HR684 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Matt Lohmeier and Jesse Elizondo for their efforts to end chronic homelessness in Corpus Christi.
Title
Honoring Matt Lohmeier and Jesse Elizondo for their efforts to end chronic homelessness in Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |