TX HR67 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the groundbreaking ceremony of the new Ruth Cherry Elementary School campus in the Royse City Independent School District.
Title
Commemorating the groundbreaking ceremony of the new Ruth Cherry Elementary School campus in the Royse City Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-07 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-05 | House | Filed |