TX HR67 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jim Rice on being elected president of the board of directors for the Texas Association of School Boards.
Title
Congratulating Jim Rice on being elected president of the board of directors for the Texas Association of School Boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |