TX HR664 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jorge Antonio Borrego and Alexandria Cisneros Borrego on the birth of their son, Jace Antonio Borrego.
Title
Congratulating Jorge Antonio Borrego and Alexandria Cisneros Borrego on the birth of their son, Jace Antonio Borrego.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORREGO, JACE ANTONIO
BORREGO, JORGE ANTONIO & ALEXANDRIA CISNEROS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
BORREGO, JORGE ANTONIO & ALEXANDRIA CISNEROS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary