TX HR663 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Welcoming members of the Greater Houston Women's Chamber of Commerce to the State Capitol on March 1, 2011.
Title
Welcoming members of the Greater Houston Women's Chamber of Commerce to the State Capitol on March 1, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-01 | Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |