TX HR648 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 24, 2015, as Washington County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 24, 2015, as Washington County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WASHINGTON COUNTY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WASHINGTON COUNTY DAY