TX HR647 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Daisy Lee Jones of Calvert on the occasion of her 108th birthday.
Title
Congratulating Daisy Lee Jones of Calvert on the occasion of her 108th birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |