TX HR647 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Pérez on the 50th anniversary of her birth, April 16, 2021.
Title
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Pérez on the 50th anniversary of her birth, April 16, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed |