TX HR64 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Principal Chief Herbert G. Johnson Sr. of the Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas.
Title
In memory of Principal Chief Herbert G. Johnson Sr. of the Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-08-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-08-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-08-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-12 | House | Filed |