TX HR637 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating The Woodlands High School girls' swimming and diving team on winning the 2021 6A state championship.
Title
Congratulating The Woodlands High School girls' swimming and diving team on winning the 2021 6A state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Filed |