TX HR609 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Texas Association of School Business Officials Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Texas Association of School Business Officials Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-28 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL BUSINESS OFFICIALS DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates