TX HR582 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Chief J. P. Steelman of the Longview Fire Department on his appointment as chair of the Texas Commission on Fire Protection.
Title
Congratulating Chief J. P. Steelman of the Longview Fire Department on his appointment as chair of the Texas Commission on Fire Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Filed |