TX HR57 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Port Neches–Groves High School baseball team on winning the 2017 UIL 5A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Port Neches–Groves High School baseball team on winning the 2017 UIL 5A state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-07-21 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-07-20 | House | Filed |