TX HR546 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Dr. Rosanne Popp of Houston for her participation in the Physician of the Day program at the State Capitol.
Title
Honoring Dr. Rosanne Popp of Houston for her participation in the Physician of the Day program at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |