TX HR537 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating The Beginning Mexican Grill on being selected as the Anahuac Area Chamber of Commerce Member of the Month.
Title
Congratulating The Beginning Mexican Grill on being selected as the Anahuac Area Chamber of Commerce Member of the Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |