TX HR465 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Gil and Cheryl Holt of Bedford on the occasion of their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Gil and Cheryl Holt of Bedford on the occasion of their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-13 | Filed |