TX HR451 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Dr. Laura Nietfeld of San Antonio as Physician of the Day on March 10, 2023.
Title
Honoring Dr. Laura Nietfeld of San Antonio as Physician of the Day on March 10, 2023.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |