TX HR445 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending U.S. Army Major General Dana J. H. Pittard on his outstanding service as commander of Fort Bliss in El Paso.
Title
Commending U.S. Army Major General Dana J. H. Pittard on his outstanding service as commander of Fort Bliss in El Paso.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-02-28 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-02-28 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |