TX HR443 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--CORPUS CHRISTI DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--CORPUS CHRISTI DAY