TX HR442 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Matthew Stafford on leading the Los Angeles Rams to the 2022 Super Bowl championship.
Title
Congratulating Matthew Stafford on leading the Los Angeles Rams to the 2022 Super Bowl championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |