TX HR418 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending truckers for their service during Winter Storm Uri.
Title
Commending truckers for their service during Winter Storm Uri.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed |