TX HR403 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the 25th anniversary of the Texas Lottery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 25th anniversary of the Texas Lottery.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02HouseReported enrolled
2017-02-23HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-02-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-02-23HouseAdopted
2017-02-23HouseLaid before the House
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-02-21HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback