TX HR4 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Sarah Wiseman of Liberty High School in Frisco on receiving the 2021 James F. Veninga Outstanding Teaching of the Humanities Award from Humanities Texas.
Title
Congratulating Sarah Wiseman of Liberty High School in Frisco on receiving the 2021 James F. Veninga Outstanding Teaching of the Humanities Award from Humanities Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-09-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-09-27 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-17 | House | Filed |