TX HR4 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Lou Ann Raetz on being named 2012 Civilian Employee of the Year by the McKinney Police Department.
Title
Congratulating Lou Ann Raetz on being named 2012 Civilian Employee of the Year by the McKinney Police Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-07-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-10 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-07-02 | House | Filed |